|
06/04/2012
|
By a vote of 61 yeas, 19 nays, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the House refused to approve consideration after the 82nd calendar day.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2012
|
Notice removed.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/1/2012.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/31/2012.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/29/2012.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2012
|
Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/15/2012
|
Reported with amendments (12-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
Substitute for Senate Bill No. 108. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|