LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Louisiana LA
Legislatures
2013 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB109
Action History
LA
Louisiana House Bill HB109
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Louisiana 2013 Regular Session
Louisiana House Bill HB109
Action History
House
04/18/2013
Becomes HB No. 719.
House
04/17/2013
Reported by substitute (14-0) (Regular)
House
04/08/2013
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
House
03/15/2013
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/15/2013.
House
03/12/2013
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
House
03/12/2013
Prefiled.