House
|
06/12/2013
|
Effective date: August 1, 2013.
|
|
|
House
|
06/12/2013
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 242.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2013
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2013
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2013
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2013
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2013
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2013
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2013
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 95, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2013
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/4/2013.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2013
|
Conference committee report received.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2013
|
Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2013
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Morrell, Thompson, and Peacock.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2013
|
Notice the House rejected the Senate amendments; House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2013
|
House conferees appointed: Chaney, Arnold, and Fannin.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2013
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 96, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 5/28/2013.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2013
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 4/29/2013.
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - local and consent calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2013
|
Reported favorably (13-0) (Local and Consent).
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2013
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2013
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/22/2013.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2013
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2013
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|