Senate
|
05/28/2013
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 4/30/2013.
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2013
|
Reported with amendments (12-0) (Regular).
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2013
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works.
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2013
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/1/2013.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2013
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2013
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|