House | 05/20/2013 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. | ||
House | 05/20/2013 | Rules suspended. | ||
House | 05/20/2013 | Reported favorably (7-0) (Regular) To be recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. | ||
House | 04/08/2013 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | ||
House | 04/01/2013 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/1/2013. | ||
House | 03/29/2013 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | ||
House | 03/29/2013 | Prefiled. |