House
|
06/17/2013
|
Effective date: June 17, 2013.
|
|
|
House
|
06/17/2013
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 333.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2013
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2013
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2013
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2013
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 96, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2013
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 6/03/2013.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2013
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2013
|
The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2013
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 4/30/2013.
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - local and consent calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2013
|
Reported favorably (14-0) (Local and Consent).
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2013
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2013
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/1/2013.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2013
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2013
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|