House
|
06/19/2013
|
Effective date: January 1, 2014.
|
|
|
House
|
06/19/2013
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 403.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2013
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2013
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2013
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2013
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 92, nays 2, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2013
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 6/4/2013.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2013
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2013
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2013
|
Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2013
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 74, nays 8. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2013
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 4/25/2013.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2013
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Read by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 21 reported by the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice (14-0).
|
|
|