Senate | 05/29/2013 | Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | ||
House | 05/29/2013 | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 60, nays 36. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 05/23/2013 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/29/2013. | ||
House | 05/22/2013 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/21/2013 | Reported favorably (11-0). | ||
House | 05/10/2013 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | ||
House | 05/09/2013 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |