House | 06/06/2013 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | ||
Senate | 06/06/2013 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | ||
House | 06/06/2013 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
House | 06/06/2013 | Read by title, roll called, yeas 97, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. | ||
House | 06/05/2013 | Scheduled for concurrence on 6/6/2013. | ||
House | 06/05/2013 | Received from the Senate with amendments. | ||
Senate | 06/05/2013 | Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. | ||
Senate | 06/04/2013 | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. | ||
Senate | 05/27/2013 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2013 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 05/23/2013 | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |