House
|
05/28/2013
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/28/2013.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Reported favorably (6-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2013
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2013
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|