Senate
|
05/31/2013
|
Effective date 5/31/2013.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2013
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 66.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2013
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2013
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2013
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 86, nays 4. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Scheduled for floor debate on May 22, 2013.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2013
|
Reported with amendments (8-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2013
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2013
|
Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted; read by title and returned to its regular order on third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2013
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2013
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
|
|
|