Senate | 05/14/2013 | Called from the Calendar. Read by title; withdrawn from the files of the Senate. | ||
Senate | 05/06/2013 | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | ||
Senate | 04/30/2013 | Read by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered reengrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | ||
Senate | 04/29/2013 | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. | ||
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted; ordered engrossed and recommitted to the Committee on Finance. | ||
Senate | 04/16/2013 | Reported with amendments. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2013 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Retirement. | ||
Senate | 02/06/2013 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Retirement. |