Senate | 04/29/2013 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/26/2013. | ||
House | 04/25/2013 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
Senate | 04/23/2013 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2013 | Received from the House without amendments. | ||
House | 04/18/2013 | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. | ||
House | 04/18/2013 | Received in the House from the Senate. | ||
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. | ||
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Rules suspended. | ||
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Reported favorably. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2013 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |