Louisiana 2013 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SR130

Introduced
5/27/13  
Passed
5/28/13  

Caption

Commends the organizers of the Louisiana Hugh O'Brian Youth Leadership seminars and recognizes June 14, 2013, as "Hugh O'Brian Youth Leadership Day" in Louisiana.

Impact

SR130 serves to shine a spotlight on the importance of youth leadership programs and their role in developing future leaders in Louisiana. The resolution underscores the foundation's achievements, which include helping over four hundred thousand students discover and develop their leadership abilities. By establishing a day dedicated to this initiative, the state recognizes the value of training young individuals to take on roles of responsibility within their communities. The impact of this resolution is primarily symbolic but highlights the state's support for educational programs aimed at fostering civic responsibility and personal growth in the youth.

Summary

Senate Resolution No. 130, introduced by Senator Perry, recognizes and commends the organizers of the Louisiana Hugh O'Brian Youth Leadership seminars. This resolution also designates June 14, 2013, as 'Hugh O'Brian Youth Leadership Day' in Louisiana, celebrating the efforts of a foundation that has been integral in fostering leadership among high school students. The Hugh O'Brian Youth Leadership Foundation, founded by actor Hugh O'Brian, aims to identify and cultivate the leadership potential of youth across the country through seminars and workshops that engage participants with established leaders from various fields.

Sentiment

The sentiment surrounding SR130 is overwhelmingly positive, as it expresses commendation for efforts that promote leadership among young people. Lawmakers and participants in the discussions likely view this resolution as a necessary acknowledgment of programs that contribute significantly to empowering the youth of Louisiana. It reflects a consensus on the societal benefits of nurturing leadership skills at an early age, with legislators uniting to celebrate these valuable contributions to community and education.

Contention

There appears to be minimal contention surrounding SR130, as resolutions of this nature tend to generate broad support and rarely face opposition. However, discussions might reflect a recognition of the varying effectiveness of such leadership programs and debate about the proper allocation of resources to support youth initiatives. Overall, the resolution stands as a testament to the shared belief in the value of community and youth engagement, which is unlikely to provoke significant disagreement within the legislative framework.

Companion Bills

No companion bills found.

Previously Filed As

LA SCR134

Commends the organizers of the Louisiana Hugh O'Brian Youth Leadership seminars and recognizes June 15, 2012, as "Hugh O'Brian Youth Leadership Day" in the state of Louisiana.

LA SCR52

Commends the organizers of the Louisiana Hugh O'Brian Youth Leadership seminars and to recognize June 3, 2011, as Hugh O'Brian Youth Leadership Day.

LA HR206

Commends the organizers of the Louisiana Hugh O'Brian Youth Leadership seminars and designates June 1, 2016, as Hugh O'Brian Youth Leadership Day

LA SR172

Commends the organizers of the Louisiana Hugh O'Brian Youth Leadership seminars and recognizes June 1, 2016, as HOBY Youth Leadership Day at the Capitol.

LA HR60

Commends the efforts of the organizers of the Louisiana Hugh O'Brian Youth Leadership seminars and recognizes June 3, 2011, as Hugh O'Brian Youth Leadership Day in La.

LA SCR120

Commends the efforts of the organizers of the Louisiana Hugh O'Brian Youth Leadership seminars and recognizes June 17, 2010, as Hugh O'Brian Youth Leadership Day in the state of Louisiana.

LA SR107

Commends the efforts of the organizers of the Louisiana Hugh O'Brian Youth Leadership seminars.

Similar Bills

CA AB2777

Office of Information Security: Baseline Information Security Score.

CA SB1462

Youth civic engagement: California Youth Leadership Project.

LA SR111

Commends Leadership Northshore and welcomes the 2019 class to the state capitol.

LA SR24

Commends Leadership Northshore and welcomes the 2020 Class.

SC H3894

Greer Chamber of Commerce

TX HB1340

Relating to the use of positive behavioral interventions and supports in public schools.

AL SB300

To create the School Principal Leadership and Mentoring Act and the Alabama Principal Leadership Development System for public K-12 education; to provide for the creation and implementation of a mentoring program for new principals and a continuing professional learning program for principals and assistant principals; and to provide annual stipends for each principal and assistant principal who satisfactorily completes the program.

DE HCR57

Recognizing The Student Officer Leadership Team And State Advisors From Across The State Of Delaware Participating In The 2022-2023 Session Of The Delaware Association Of Business Professionals Of America State Leadership Conference.