LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Louisiana LA
Legislatures
2013 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SSR1
Action History
LA
Louisiana Senate Bill SSR1
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Louisiana 2013 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SSR1
Action History
Senate
05/29/2013
Approved on 5/29/2013.
Senate
05/21/2013
Study request list distributed to the members on 5/21/2013.
Senate
05/20/2013
Request study by the committee on Judiciary B.
Senate
05/20/2013
Received by the Senate Office on 5/20/2013.