House | 04/14/2014 | Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 04/10/2014 | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/14/2014. | ||
House | 04/09/2014 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 04/08/2014 | Reported favorably (10-0). | ||
House | 03/10/2014 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. | ||
House | 02/07/2014 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/7/2014. | ||
House | 02/06/2014 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. | ||
House | 02/06/2014 | Prefiled. |