House | 04/01/2014 | Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 03/27/2014 | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/01/2014. | ||
House | 03/25/2014 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 03/24/2014 | Reported favorably (20-0). | ||
House | 03/10/2014 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. | ||
House | 02/14/2014 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/14/2014. | ||
House | 02/11/2014 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations. | ||
House | 02/11/2014 | Prefiled. |