DIGEST The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services. It constitutes no part of the legislative instrument. The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute part of the law or proof or indicia of legislative intent. [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)] Ponti HB No. 231 Abstract: Re-creates the Dept. of Public Service. Present law (Sunset) provides that the Dept. of Public Service and all the statutory entities made a part of that department by law shall begin to terminate their operations on July 1, 2014, and that all legislative authority for such entities shall cease as of July 1, 2015, unless the legislature enacts a bill authorizing the re-creation of the department and its statutory entities prior thereto. Proposed law provides for the general re-creation of the Dept. of Public Service and its statutory entities, effective June 30, 2014, in accordance with the "sunset" law. Proposed law supersedes the provisions of the "sunset" law which set out the procedure for review and re-creation and which require a separate bill to re-create each statutory entity within the department along with additional provisions. Proposed law makes July 1, 2019, the new termination date and termination would begin July 1, 2018, unless the department is re-created again. Effective June 30, 2014. (Adds R.S. 49:191(7); Repeals R.S. 49:191(5)(b)) Summary of Amendments Adopted by House Committee Amendments Proposed by House Committee on Commerce to the original bill. 1. Made technical changes.