HLS 14RS-370 ENGROSSED Page 1 of 3 CODING: Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored are additions. Regular Session, 2014 HOUSE BILL NO. 231 BY REPRESENTATIVE PONTI SUNSET LAW: Re-creates the Department of Public Service AN ACT1 To enact R.S. 49:191(7) and to repeal R.S. 49:191(5)(b), relative to the Department of2 Public Service, including provisions to provide for the re-creation of the Department3 of Public Service and the statutory entities made a part of the department by law; to4 provide for the effective termination date for all statutory authority for the existence5 of such statutory entities; and to provide for related matters.6 Be it enacted by the Legislature of Louisiana:7 Section 1. Pursuant to R.S. 49:193, the Department of Public Service and the8 statutory entities made a part of the department by law shall be re-created effective June 30,9 2014, and all statutory authority therefor is continued in accordance with the provisions of10 Part XII of Chapter 1 of Title 49 of the Louisiana Revised Statutes of 1950.11 Section 2. All statutory authority for the existence of the Department of Public12 Service and the statutory entities made a part of the department as re-created by Section 113 of this Act shall cease as of July 1, 2019, pursuant to R.S. 49:191. However, the Department14 of Public Service may be re-created prior to such date in accordance with the provisions of15 Part XII of Chapter 1 of Title 49 of the Louisiana Revised Statutes of 1950.16 Section 3. The provisions of R.S. 49:193 are hereby superseded to the extent that17 those provisions are in conflict with the provisions of this Act.18 Section 4. R.S. 49:191(7) is hereby enacted to read as follows: 19 HLS 14RS-370 ENGROSSED HB NO. 231 Page 2 of 3 CODING: Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored are additions. ยง191. Termination of legislative authority for existence of statutory entities; phase-1 out period for statutory entities; table of dates2 Notwithstanding any termination dates set by any previous Act of the3 legislature, the statutory entities set forth in this Section shall begin to terminate their4 operations on July first of each of the following years, and all legislative authority5 for the existence of any statutory entity, as defined in R.S. 49:190, shall cease as of6 July first of the following year, which shall be the termination date:7 * * *8 (7) July 1, 2018:9 (a) The Department of Public Service and all statutory entities made a part10 of the department by law.11 Section 5. R.S. 49:191(5)(b) is hereby repealed in its entirety.12 Section 6. This Act shall become effective on June 30, 2014; if vetoed by the13 governor and subsequently approved by the legislature, this Act shall become effective on14 June 30, 2014, or on the day following such approval by the legislature, whichever is later.15 DIGEST The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services. It constitutes no part of the legislative instrument. The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute part of the law or proof or indicia of legislative intent. [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)] Ponti HB No. 231 Abstract: Re-creates the Dept. of Public Service. Present law (Sunset) provides that the Dept. of Public Service and all the statutory entities made a part of that department by law shall begin to terminate their operations on July 1, 2014, and that all legislative authority for such entities shall cease as of July 1, 2015, unless the legislature enacts a bill authorizing the re-creation of the department and its statutory entities prior thereto. Proposed law provides for the general re-creation of the Dept. of Public Service and its statutory entities, effective June 30, 2014, in accordance with the "sunset" law. Proposed law supersedes the provisions of the "sunset" law which set out the procedure for review and re-creation and which require a separate bill to re-create each statutory entity within the department along with additional provisions. Proposed law makes July 1, 2019, the new termination date and termination would begin July 1, 2018, unless the department is re-created again. HLS 14RS-370 ENGROSSED HB NO. 231 Page 3 of 3 CODING: Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored are additions. Effective June 30, 2014. (Adds R.S. 49:191(7); Repeals R.S. 49:191(5)(b)) Summary of Amendments Adopted by House Committee Amendments Proposed by House Committee on Commerce to the original bill. 1. Made technical changes.