House
|
05/16/2014
|
Effective date: 05/16/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2014
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 59.
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2014
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2014
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2014
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2014
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2014
|
Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2014
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2014
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2014
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2014
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2014
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2014
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 88, nays 2. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2014
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 03/24/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2014
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2014
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2014
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 03/19/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2014
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2014
|
Reported favorably (7-0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2014
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2014
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2014
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|