House | 03/31/2014 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 34, nays 57. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider tabled. | ||
House | 03/27/2014 | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/31/2014. | ||
House | 03/20/2014 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 03/19/2014 | Reported with amendments (10-0). | ||
House | 03/10/2014 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance. | ||
House | 02/26/2014 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance. | ||
House | 02/26/2014 | Prefiled. |