House
|
06/23/2014
|
Effective date: August 1, 2014.
|
|
|
House
|
06/23/2014
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 823.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2014
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2014
|
Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/3/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2014
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2014
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2014
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 1 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2014
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2014
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 95, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2014
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2014
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2014
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/01/2014.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2014
|
Conference committee report received.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2014
|
Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2014
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2014
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Appel, Erdey, and White.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2014
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2014
|
House conferees appointed: Broadwater, Carter, and Reynolds.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2014
|
Notice House rejected the Senate amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2014
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 90, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2014
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/21/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2014
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2014
|
Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2014
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2014
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2014
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2014
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2014
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2014
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2014
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/03/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2014
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2014
|
Reported with amendments (11-0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2014
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2014
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2014
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|