Senate
|
04/02/2014
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2014
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2014
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 69, nays 12. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2014
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2014
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/01/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2014
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2014
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2014
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 03/26/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2014
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2014
|
Reported with amendments (13-0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2014
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2014
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2014
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|