House | 04/07/2014 | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/14/2014. | ||
House | 04/07/2014 | Notice given. | ||
House | 04/07/2014 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 04/03/2014 | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/07/2014. | ||
House | 04/01/2014 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 03/31/2014 | Reported favorably (12-1-1). | ||
House | 03/10/2014 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. | ||
House | 02/07/2014 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/7/2014. | ||
House | 01/31/2014 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. | ||
House | 01/31/2014 | Prefiled. |