House | 04/22/2014 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 33, nays 60. Failed to pass. | ||
House | 04/16/2014 | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/22/2014. | ||
House | 04/15/2014 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 04/14/2014 | Reported favorably (12-0). | ||
House | 03/10/2014 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. | ||
House | 02/28/2014 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary. | ||
House | 02/28/2014 | Prefiled. |