House | 05/19/2014 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | ||
Senate | 05/12/2014 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | ||
House | 05/08/2014 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
House | 05/07/2014 | Read by title, Senate amendments concurred in. | ||
House | 04/30/2014 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/07/2014. | ||
House | 04/30/2014 | Notice given. | ||
House | 04/28/2014 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 04/24/2014 | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/28/2014. | ||
House | 04/23/2014 | Received from the Senate with amendments. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2014 | Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. | ||
Senate | 04/21/2014 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 04/21/2014 | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |