Senate | 05/14/2014 | Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. | ||
House | 05/13/2014 | Read by title, amended, roll called on final consideration, yeas 75, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 05/08/2014 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/13/2014. | ||
House | 05/07/2014 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/06/2014 | Reported with amendments (6-0). | ||
House | 04/29/2014 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | ||
House | 04/28/2014 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |