Louisiana 2014 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HCR80

Introduced
4/14/14  
Introduced
4/14/14  
Engrossed
4/14/14  
Engrossed
4/14/14  

Caption

Commends the efforts of The Links, Incorporated and recognizes Wednesday, April 23, 2014, as Louisiana Links Day at the state capitol

Companion Bills

No companion bills found.

Similar Bills

LA HR67

Commends the efforts of The Links, Incorporated and recognizes Wednesday, April 23, 2014, as Louisiana Links Day at the state capitol

LA SCR126

Commends the service and contributions of The Links, Incorporated, and recognizes May 25, 2016, as Louisiana Links Day at the state capitol.

LA SCR66

Commends the efforts of The Links, Incorporated and designates Monday, May 8, 2017, as Louisiana Links Day at the state capitol.

LA HCR119

Commends the efforts of The Links, Incorporated and recognizes May 15, 2013, as La. Links Day at the capitol

LA SB674

Provides relative to incorporation of unincorporated areas. (gov sig) (RE1 +$24,000 GF EX See Note)

LA HCR100

Commends the efforts of The Links, Incorporated, and designates Wednesday, May 6, 2015, as Louisiana Links Day at the state capitol

LA HR92

Commends the efforts of The Links, Incorporated, and designates May 8, 2017, as Louisiana Links Day at the state capitol

LA SR60

Commends the efforts of The Links, Incorporated and designates Thursday, April 25, 2019, as Louisiana Links Day at the state capitol.