Commends the efforts of The Links, Incorporated and recognizes Wednesday, April 23, 2014, as Louisiana Links Day at the state capitol
Commends the efforts of The Links, Incorporated and recognizes Wednesday, April 23, 2014, as Louisiana Links Day at the state capitol
Commends the service and contributions of The Links, Incorporated, and recognizes May 25, 2016, as Louisiana Links Day at the state capitol.
Commends the efforts of The Links, Incorporated and designates Monday, May 8, 2017, as Louisiana Links Day at the state capitol.
Commends the efforts of The Links, Incorporated and recognizes May 15, 2013, as La. Links Day at the capitol
Provides relative to incorporation of unincorporated areas. (gov sig) (RE1 +$24,000 GF EX See Note)
Commends the efforts of The Links, Incorporated, and designates Wednesday, May 6, 2015, as Louisiana Links Day at the state capitol
Commends the efforts of The Links, Incorporated and designates Thursday, April 25, 2019, as Louisiana Links Day at the state capitol.