Senate | 05/06/2014 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. | ||
Senate | 05/05/2014 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 05/05/2014 | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 44, nays 43. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 04/30/2014 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/05/2014. | ||
House | 04/30/2014 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 04/29/2014 | Reported favorably (4-1). | ||
House | 04/21/2014 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | ||
House | 04/16/2014 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |