Louisiana 2014 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SB416

Introduced
3/10/14  
Introduced
3/10/14  
Refer
3/10/14  

Caption

Provides relative to the Louisiana Professional Engineering and Land Surveying Board. (8/1/14)

Impact

The bill specifies that the governor will appoint members based on recommendations from key professional organizations, namely the Louisiana Engineering Society and the Louisiana Society of Professional Surveyors. The proposed legislation decreases the number of required nominations for appointments from five to three and mandates that nominations be made promptly following the vacancy of a board member. This change is intended to streamline the appointment process and ensure that the board can maintain adequate governance without extended delays in filling positions.

Summary

Senate Bill 416 proposes amendments to the existing statutes governing the Louisiana Professional Engineering and Land Surveying Board. The current structure of the board consists of eleven members, with nine licensed professional engineers and two licensed professional land surveyors. SB416 seeks to increase the total number of board members from eleven to thirteen, adjusting the composition to ten licensed professional engineers and three licensed professional land surveyors. This modification aims to enhance representation on the board, particularly for land surveyors, who will see an increased presence.

Sentiment

The sentiment surrounding SB416 is generally supportive among professional engineering and surveying communities, as it reflects a commitment to improved governance and representation within the board. Stakeholders express optimism that the changes will lead to enhanced professional oversight and accountability. However, there remains a level of scrutiny regarding the implications of decreasing the nomination requirement, with some concerns that it may reduce transparency in the selection process.

Contention

Notable points of contention revolve around the balance of representation among various engineering disciplines and the potential impacts on board functionality. Opponents might argue that while expansion can enhance diversity, it also risks complicating decision-making processes if not managed effectively. Additionally, the reduction in nominations could be seen as a step away from inclusive practices, potentially favoring established nominees over emerging professionals. As such, the implications of these amendments warrant careful consideration by the legislature and stakeholders.

Companion Bills

No companion bills found.

Previously Filed As

LA SB41

Provides for screening of pregnant women for HIV and syphillis in the third trimester of pregnancy. (gov sig)

Similar Bills

LA SR15

Commends the Louisiana Society of Professional Surveyors and recognizes March 18, 2014, as "Louisiana Society of Professional Surveyors Day" at the State Capitol.

LA HCR156

Recognizes May 11, 2010, as La. Society of Professional Surveyors Day at the Capitol

LA SR50

Recognizes April 27, 2017, as Louisiana Society of Professional Surveyors Day at the Louisiana State Capitol.

LA SR100

Recognizes May 5, 2016, as Louisiana Society of Professional Surveyors Day at the Louisiana State Capitol.

LA SR26

Recognizes Tuesday, May 3, 2011, as Louisiana Society of Professional Surveyors Day at the Louisiana State Capitol.

LA SR71

Designates Tuesday, May 11, 2010, as "Louisiana Society of Professional Surveyors Day" at the legislature.

LA HCR263

Urges and requests the La. Professional Engineering and Land Surveying Board to suspend charging fees from professional engineers and professional land surveyors who have been classified as retired

LA HCR36

Designates April 25, 2019, as Louisiana Society of Professional Surveyors Day at the Louisiana State Capitol