Senate
|
06/04/2014
|
Effective date 8/1/2014.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2014
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 464.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2014
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2014
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2014
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2014
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2014
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 85, nays 3. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2014
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/21/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2014
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2014
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2014
|
Reported favorably (14-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2014
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works.
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2014
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2014
|
Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2014
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2014
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2014
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2014
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|