Senate
|
06/01/2014
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2014
|
House conferees appointed: Wesley Bishop, Fannin, and Pierre.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2014
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2014
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Morrell, Donahue, and Chabert.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2014
|
Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2014
|
Rules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2014
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2014
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2014
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/29/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2014
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2014
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2014
|
Reported with amendments (16-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2014
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2014
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2014
|
Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2014
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2014
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2014
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2014
|
Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|