LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Louisiana LA
Legislatures
2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB628
Action History
LA
Louisiana Senate Bill SB628
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Louisiana 2014 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SB628
Action History
Senate
05/05/2014
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Senate
04/30/2014
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
Senate
04/29/2014
Reported favorably.
Senate
04/02/2014
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
Senate
04/01/2014
Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.