Senate | 05/20/2014 | Called from the Calendar. Read by title; withdrawn from the files of the Senate. | ||
Senate | 05/12/2014 | The amended bill was read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | ||
Senate | 05/12/2014 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. | ||
Senate | 05/06/2014 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | ||
Senate | 05/05/2014 | Reported with amendments. | ||
Senate | 04/02/2014 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education. | ||
Senate | 04/01/2014 | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |