Senate
|
06/01/2014
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2014
|
House conferees appointed: Wesley Bishop, Carter, and Jefferson.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2014
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2014
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Morrell, Appel, and White.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2014
|
Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2014
|
Rules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2014
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2014
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2014
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/30/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2014
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2014
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2014
|
Reported with amendments (11-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2014
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2014
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2014
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2014
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2014
|
Substitute for Senate Bill No. 437. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|