House | 06/02/2014 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 48, nays 44. Under the rules, failed to pass. | ||
House | 06/02/2014 | Called from the calendar. | ||
House | 06/02/2014 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 05/30/2014 | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/02/2014. | ||
House | 05/28/2014 | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/27/2014 | Reported with amendments (12-0). | ||
House | 05/21/2014 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | ||
House | 05/20/2014 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. | ||
House | 05/20/2014 | Received in the House from the Senate. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2014 | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. | ||
Senate | 05/19/2014 | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |