Senate | 04/03/2014 | Returned to the Senate and approved. | ||
House | 04/02/2014 | Approved on 4/2/2014. | ||
House | 03/31/2014 | Study request list distributed to members on 3/31/2014. | ||
House | 03/31/2014 | Received on 3/26/2014. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2014 | Study request list distributed to the members on 3/18/2014. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2014 | Request study by the committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2014 | Received by the Senate Office on 3/18/2014. |