Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/3/2014.
Senate
05/30/2014
Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted.
Senate
05/29/2014
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
Senate
05/28/2014
Reported with amendments.
Senate
05/27/2014
Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.