Senate
|
06/04/2015
|
Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and recommitted to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 80, nays 17. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/26/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 65, nays 26. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass. Motion to reconsider pending.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/20/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 4/30/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Reported with amendments (11-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2015
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/27/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2015
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2015
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|