House
|
06/29/2015
|
Effective date: August 1, 2015.
|
|
|
House
|
06/29/2015
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 302.
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2015
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2015
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2015
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2015
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 80, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/04/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/11/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Reported favorably (16-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2015
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2015
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|