Senate
|
06/05/2015
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2015
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2015
|
Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Senate Committee amendments read and adopted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/13/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Notice removed
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/07/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/05/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Reported with amendments (14-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2015
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2015
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|