House | 06/15/2015 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | ||
Senate | 06/11/2015 | Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/10/2015. | ||
House | 06/10/2015 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
House | 06/09/2015 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | ||
Senate | 06/09/2015 | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. | ||
Senate | 06/08/2015 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 06/07/2015 | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 94, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 06/03/2015 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/07/2015. | ||
House | 06/03/2015 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 06/02/2015 | Reported favorably (12-0). | ||
House | 05/27/2015 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | ||
House | 05/26/2015 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |