Louisiana 2015 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HCR178

Introduced
5/26/15  
Introduced
5/26/15  
Refer
5/27/15  
Refer
5/27/15  
Report Pass
6/2/15  
Report Pass
6/2/15  
Engrossed
6/8/15  
Engrossed
6/8/15  
Passed
6/10/15  

Caption

Expresses the intention and commitment of the legislature to renew the state's focus on implementation of the State Alzheimer's Plan recommended by the Louisiana Alzheimer's Disease Task Force

Impact

The bill reflects a significant effort to enhance the state's approach to Alzheimer's care by renewing commitment to the findings and recommendations of the Louisiana Alzheimer's Disease Task Force, which was originally established in 2008. The implementation of the State Alzheimer's Plan is expected to aid Louisiana in becoming a dementia-capable state, addressing various crucial aspects like infrastructure, data collection, education and training, early diagnosis, and healthcare coverage. These improvements will not only benefit those suffering from Alzheimer's but also ease the burden on caregivers who often face tremendous emotional and financial challenges.

Summary

HCR178 expresses the intention and commitment of the Louisiana Legislature to renew focus on implementing the State Alzheimer's Plan recommended by the Louisiana Alzheimer's Disease Task Force. This plan aims to address the growing impact of Alzheimer's disease in Louisiana, particularly considering its prevalence among seniors and the emotional and financial burdens placed on their families and caregivers. The resolution emphasizes the importance of collaboration between the legislature, the Department of Health and Hospitals, and the Alzheimer's Association to improve care for those affected by this disease.

Sentiment

The sentiment surrounding HCR178 is predominantly supportive, stemming from the recognition of the urgent need to tackle Alzheimer's disease and its impacts on families and the healthcare system. Legislators and advocates are united in their understanding that a proactive approach, combining governmental support and community resources, is essential in responding to this growing health crisis. This broad consensus reflects an increasing acknowledgement of the importance of mental health and cognitive care in broader health policy discussions.

Contention

While there appears to be general agreement on the necessity of addressing Alzheimer's, potential points of contention may arise around funding and resource allocation for the implementation of recommended measures in the State Alzheimer's Plan. As the legislature moves forward, discussions will likely focus on how to best allocate state resources towards training, education, and support for caregivers, as well as ensuring adequate healthcare coverage for those affected by Alzheimer's. Tensions could emerge between budgetary constraints and the urgent need for enhancing services and support systems.

Companion Bills

No companion bills found.

Similar Bills

LA SCR81

Recognizes May 4, 2016, as Alzheimer's Awareness Day at the state capitol and expresses the continued support of the Louisiana Alzheimer's Disease Task Force's Final Report and the implementation of its recommendations.

LA SCR109

Recognizes May 27, 2015, as Alzheimer's Awareness Day at the state capitol and expresses the continued support of the Louisiana Alzheimer's Disease Task Force's Final Report.

LA HCR101

Expresses the intention and commitment of the legislature to renew the state's focus on implementation of the State Alzheimer's Plan recommended by the Louisiana Alzheimer's Disease Task Force

LA SR69

Expresses the Louisiana Senate's continued support of the Louisiana Alzheimer's Disease Task Force's 2009 Final Report and the implementation of its recommendations.

LA SCR26

Designates April 20, 2017, as Alzheimer's Awareness Day at the state capitol and expresses the continued support of the Louisiana Alzheimer's Disease Task Force's Final Report and the implementation of its recommendations.

LA HCR87

Recognizes Wednesday, April 23, 2014, as Alzheimer's Awareness Day at the state capitol and commends the Louisiana chapter of the Alzheimer's Association

LA HB397

Provides relative to public health programs and services related to Alzheimer's disease and other dementias

LA SR48

Designates May 6, 2025, as Alzheimer's and Related Dementias Awareness Day at the Louisiana State Capitol.