Louisiana 2014 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SR69

Introduced
4/21/14  
Introduced
4/21/14  
Passed
4/22/14  

Caption

Expresses the Louisiana Senate's continued support of the Louisiana Alzheimer's Disease Task Force's 2009 Final Report and the implementation of its recommendations.

Impact

The resolution aims to mobilize state resources toward the implementation of strategies outlined by the task force, including infrastructure development, data collection for better understanding the disease's progression, and increased emphasis on education and training regarding Alzheimer's care. If the recommendations are fully implemented, Louisiana would take significant steps toward becoming a dementia-capable state, enhancing its ability to meet the social and healthcare demands tied to Alzheimer's.

Summary

Senate Resolution 69 expresses the Louisiana Senate's continued support for the recommendations made by the Louisiana Alzheimer's Disease Task Force in its 2009 Final Report. The resolution underscores the growing concern regarding Alzheimer's disease, which affects a significant portion of the senior population in Louisiana, with over 81,000 residents diagnosed. By highlighting the critical issues related to Alzheimer's, this resolution seeks to reaffirm the state's commitment to addressing the needs of individuals living with the disease, as well as their families and caregivers.

Sentiment

The sentiment surrounding SR 69 appears to be supportive among legislators and healthcare advocates. The resolution brings attention to a critical health issue that affects many families in Louisiana and emphasizes the emotional and financial toll Alzheimer's takes on communities. The acknowledgment of the role of caregivers, particularly women, contributes to a broader discourse about the importance of support systems for those affected by the disease.

Contention

While SR 69 does not appear to encounter significant opposition, there may be underlying concerns related to funding and resource allocation for the proposed implementation of the task force's recommendations. Some might argue that more significant legislative action or funding might be necessary to ensure that the needs outlined in the 2009 report are adequately addressed. Nevertheless, the resolution serves as a reaffirmation of Louisiana's legislative priorities concerning Alzheimer's care and support.

Companion Bills

No companion bills found.

Similar Bills

LA SCR81

Recognizes May 4, 2016, as Alzheimer's Awareness Day at the state capitol and expresses the continued support of the Louisiana Alzheimer's Disease Task Force's Final Report and the implementation of its recommendations.

LA SCR109

Recognizes May 27, 2015, as Alzheimer's Awareness Day at the state capitol and expresses the continued support of the Louisiana Alzheimer's Disease Task Force's Final Report.

LA HCR101

Expresses the intention and commitment of the legislature to renew the state's focus on implementation of the State Alzheimer's Plan recommended by the Louisiana Alzheimer's Disease Task Force

LA HCR178

Expresses the intention and commitment of the legislature to renew the state's focus on implementation of the State Alzheimer's Plan recommended by the Louisiana Alzheimer's Disease Task Force

LA SCR26

Designates April 20, 2017, as Alzheimer's Awareness Day at the state capitol and expresses the continued support of the Louisiana Alzheimer's Disease Task Force's Final Report and the implementation of its recommendations.

LA HCR87

Recognizes Wednesday, April 23, 2014, as Alzheimer's Awareness Day at the state capitol and commends the Louisiana chapter of the Alzheimer's Association

LA HB397

Provides relative to public health programs and services related to Alzheimer's disease and other dementias

LA SR48

Designates May 6, 2025, as Alzheimer's and Related Dementias Awareness Day at the Louisiana State Capitol.