Louisiana 2015 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SCR109

Introduced
5/20/15  
Introduced
5/20/15  
Passed
5/21/15  
Passed
5/21/15  

Caption

Recognizes May 27, 2015, as Alzheimer's Awareness Day at the state capitol and expresses the continued support of the Louisiana Alzheimer's Disease Task Force's Final Report.

Impact

The bill is intended to mobilize state support towards becoming a dementia-capable state, addressing not just health concerns but also the socioeconomic implications of the growing Alzheimer's population. It encourages the Louisiana Department of Health to work in partnership with relevant organizations, such as the Alzheimer's Association Louisiana chapter, to implement recommendations from the Task Force's final report. This report outlines important areas for action, including education, training, early diagnosis, and enhanced caregiver support.

Summary

Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 109 (SCR109) recognizes May 27, 2015, as 'Alzheimer's Awareness Day' at the Louisiana State Capitol. The resolution expresses ongoing support for the Louisiana Alzheimer's Disease Task Force's Final Report while emphasizing the need for the implementation of its recommendations. The bill highlights the significant impact of Alzheimer's disease on individuals and families in Louisiana, underscoring the importance of awareness and support for caregivers. Emphasizing findings from the Task Force, it aims to improve services and support for those affected by the disease and their families.

Sentiment

The sentiment around SCR109 appears to be positive and supportive among legislators and stakeholders involved in the discussion. There is a recognized urgency for addressing Alzheimer's disease, considering its prevalence and the substantial burden it places on families and the healthcare system. The bill has received unanimous support with a Senate vote of 29-0, indicating a strong bipartisan agreement on the importance of Alzheimer's awareness and the need for improved care practices.

Contention

While the resolution has broad support, some points of contention may arise from the challenges of implementing the Task Force’s recommendations effectively. Concerns may include the adequacy of resources allocated to support the initiatives and how well the state can adapt to the growing needs of the demographic affected by Alzheimer's disease. Additionally, as the bill aims for greater awareness and resource mobilization, some advocates may push for more aggressive policies to ensure comprehensive coverage and support for caregivers, which has historically been a concern within health policy discussions.

Companion Bills

No companion bills found.

Similar Bills

LA SCR81

Recognizes May 4, 2016, as Alzheimer's Awareness Day at the state capitol and expresses the continued support of the Louisiana Alzheimer's Disease Task Force's Final Report and the implementation of its recommendations.

LA HCR101

Expresses the intention and commitment of the legislature to renew the state's focus on implementation of the State Alzheimer's Plan recommended by the Louisiana Alzheimer's Disease Task Force

LA HCR178

Expresses the intention and commitment of the legislature to renew the state's focus on implementation of the State Alzheimer's Plan recommended by the Louisiana Alzheimer's Disease Task Force

LA SR69

Expresses the Louisiana Senate's continued support of the Louisiana Alzheimer's Disease Task Force's 2009 Final Report and the implementation of its recommendations.

LA HCR87

Recognizes Wednesday, April 23, 2014, as Alzheimer's Awareness Day at the state capitol and commends the Louisiana chapter of the Alzheimer's Association

LA SCR26

Designates April 20, 2017, as Alzheimer's Awareness Day at the state capitol and expresses the continued support of the Louisiana Alzheimer's Disease Task Force's Final Report and the implementation of its recommendations.

LA HB397

Provides relative to public health programs and services related to Alzheimer's disease and other dementias

LA SR48

Designates May 6, 2025, as Alzheimer's and Related Dementias Awareness Day at the Louisiana State Capitol.