Senate | 05/07/2015 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. | ||
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 05/06/2015 | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 60, nays 38. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 05/05/2015 | Scheduled for floor debate on May 6, 2015. | ||
House | 04/27/2015 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 04/22/2015 | Reported favorably (6-3). | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | ||
House | 03/13/2015 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/13/2015. | ||
House | 03/09/2015 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | ||
House | 03/09/2015 | Prefiled. |