House
|
06/15/2015
|
Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/10/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2015
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2015
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2015
|
Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2015
|
Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2015
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2015
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2015
|
Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 94, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2015
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/07/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2015
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2015
|
Reported favorably (11-0).
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2015
|
Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|