House
|
05/21/2015
|
Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Read by title, amended, roll called on final consideration, yeas 98, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Scheduled for floor debate on May 6, 2015.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Reported favorably (13-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2015
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2015
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|