Louisiana 2015 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HCR5 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version

                            ENROLLED
2015 Regular Session
HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOL UTION NO. 5
BY REPRESENTATIVE ST. GERMAIN
A CONCURRENT RESOL UTION
To approve the Atchafalaya Basin Annual Plan for Fiscal Year 2015-2016, as adopted by
the Atchafalaya Basin Research and Promotion Board and the Coastal Protection and
Restoration Authority.
WHEREAS, R.S. 30:2000.1 et seq., provides for the creation, duties, and
responsibilities of the Atchafalaya Basin Program, in the office of the secretary of the
Department of Natural Resources, and the Atchafalaya Basin Research and Promotion
Board; and
WHEREAS, pursuant to R.S. 30:2000.11, a technical advisory group has been
appointed to review, evaluate, and approve all water management and water quality projects
proposed for inclusion in an annual plan to determine if the project meets the criteria for
inclusion in the Atchafalaya Basin Annual Plan, and make recommendations to the
Atchafalaya Basin Research and Promotion Board; and
WHEREAS, public participation in the development of the Atchafalaya Basin
Annual Plan is essential to the success of the Atchafalaya Basin Program; and
WHEREAS, nominations for water quality projects were accepted from July 1, 2013,
through June 30, 2014, at which time the technical advisory group reviewed and evaluated
the water quality projects that were nominated by the public and selected projects for
inclusion in the Atchafalaya Basin Annual Plan as required by R.S. 30:2000.11(B); and
WHEREAS, the Atchafalaya Basin Annual Plan was then presented for public
comment and discussion at meetings that were held on November 5, 2014, in Plaquemine,
Louisiana, on November 6, 2014, in Henderson, Louisiana, and on November 13, 2014, in
Morgan City, Louisiana; and
WHEREAS, the Atchafalaya Basin Research and Promotion Board at a public
meeting held on December 2, 2014, in Baton Rouge, Louisiana, after receiving and
considering the comments of the public, and the recommendations of the Atchafalaya Basin
Program staff, unanimously approved the draft Atchafalaya Basin Annual Plan; and
Page 1 of 2 HCR NO. 5	ENROLLED
WHEREAS, the draft Atchafalaya Basin Annual Plan was submitted on December
3, 2014, to the Coastal Protection and Restoration Authority (CPRA) pursuant to R.S.
30:2000.11(E) for their review and approval as consistent with the master plan for coastal
protection and restoration for a sustainable coast and was unanimously approved by the
CPRA at its February 11, 2015, meeting; and
WHEREAS, at a public meeting held on January 13, 2015, the Atchafalaya Basin
Research and Promotion Board, as required by R.S. 30:2000.11(D), considered and
unanimously approved the proposed Atchafalaya Basin Annual Plan in its final version; and
WHEREAS, both the CPRA and the Atchafalaya Basin Research and Promotion
Board must approve the Atchafalaya Basin Annual Plan prior to submission of the plan to
the legislature, and the legislature may approve or disapprove the Atchafalaya Basin Annual
Plan by resolution adopted by a majority vote of the members of each house of the
legislature; and
WHEREAS, the Atchafalaya Basin Annual Plan shall not be effective or
implemented unless both houses of the legislature approve the annual plan or fail to
disapprove the annual plan; and
WHEREAS, the secretary shall implement the Atchafalaya Basin Annual Plan if the
legislature approves the plan or if the legislature fails to timely disapprove of the plan.
THEREFORE, BE IT RESOLVED that the Legislature of Louisiana does hereby
approve the Atchafalaya Basin Annual Plan for Fiscal Year 2015-2016, as presented by the
secretary of the Department of Natural Resources and adopted by the Atchafalaya Basin
Research and Promotion Board and the Coastal Protection and Restoration Authority.
BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that a copy of this Resolution be transmitted to the
secretary of the Department of Natural Resources and the Atchafalaya Basin Research and
Promotion Board.
SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES
PRESIDENT OF THE SENATE
Page 2 of 2